Global Patent Index - EP 1262139 A2

EP 1262139 A2 2002-12-04 - Storage container for mop covers

Title (en)

Storage container for mop covers

Title (de)

Aufbewahrungsbehälter für Moppbezüge

Title (fr)

Boîtier de stockage de garnitures pour balai laveur

Publication

EP 1262139 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011661 A

Priority

DE 10126804 A

Abstract (en)

The bottom of the upper chamber (10) is perforated so that the fluid (6) can drip through onto the pile of blankets (13). The chamber is mounted in the upper part of the holder (3) and there is a spring-loaded valve mechanism (9) in its center, to allow extra fluid to drip onto the blankets. The lower part of the holder (2) has sides which slope slightly outwards and has a flat bottom supporting a table (15,18) for the blankets.

Abstract (de)

Ein Aufbewahrungsbehälter (1) für Moppbezüge (13) umfasst ein Behälterunterteil (2), in das die Moppbezüge (13) einlegbar sind, ein Behälteroberteil (3), das mit dem Behälterunterteil verbindbar ist, wobei das Behälteroberteil (3) eine Kammer (10) aufweist, in die Benetzungsflüssigkeit (6) einfüllbar ist und wobei ein von außen betätigbarer Ventilmechanismus (9,14) vorgesehen ist, der bei Betätigung eine Verbindung zwischen der Kammer (10) und dem Behälterunterteil (2) herstellt, so dass die Benetzungsflüssigkeit (6) aus der Kammer (10) in das Behälterunterteil gelangen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/51

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/51 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/51 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262139 A2 20021204; EP 1262139 A3 20050119; DE 10126804 A1 20021212; DE 10126804 B4 20060413

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-05-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI