Global Patent Index - EP 1262242 A2

EP 1262242 A2 2002-12-04 - Metering and dispensing valve for fluids, especially for hot water

Title (en)

Metering and dispensing valve for fluids, especially for hot water

Title (de)

Abgabe- und Dosierventil für fluidförmige Medien, insbesondere für Heisswasser

Title (fr)

Soupape de dosage et de distribution de fluides, en particulier pour de l'eau chaude

Publication

EP 1262242 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011112 A

Priority

DE 20108961 U

Abstract (en)

The emission and controlled feed fluid medium particularly hot water, comprises a valve housing (12,13,22) containing a fluid channel (2) with a fluid feed connection (14) and an outlet aperture (21) at the opposite end to the feed connection. A valve component (23) selectively opens and closes the outlet aperture. On the valve housing is a handle (11) for holding the emission and controlled feed valve and an operating component (15) is provided for the valve component. At least on the handle is at least one insulating component (17) for thermic insulation. The insulating component is made of plastic and permits operating of the emission and controlled feed valve up to temperatures of 95 degrees Celsius.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Verbesserung für ein Abgabe- und Dosierventil (1) für fluidförmige Medien mit einem Ventilgehäuse (12, 13, 22), einem in dem Ventilgehäuse ausgebildeten Fluidkanal (2), einem mit dem Fluidkanal verbundenen Zuführanschluß (14) zum Zuführen eines fluidförmigen Mediums einer an einem dem Zuführanschluß strömungsmäßig gegenüberliegenden Ende des Fluidkanals angeordneten Auslaßöffnung (21), einem Ventilelement (23) zum selektiven Öffnen sowie Verschließen der Auslaßöffnung, einer an dem Ventilgehäuse angeordneten Handhabe (11) zum Halten des Abgabe- und Dosierventils sowie einem Betätigungselement (15) zum Betätigen des Ventilelements angegeben. Um ein solches Abgabe- und Dosierventil dahingehend weiterzuentwickeln, daß es vielfältiger einsetzbar und damit flexibler verwendbar ist und insbesondere für fluidförmige Medien unterschiedlicher Temperatur verwendet werden kann, ist vorgesehen, daß zumindest an der Handhabe wenigstens ein Isolierelement (17) zur thermischen Isolierung angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/06; B05B 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/30 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B05B 9/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/3046 (2013.01); B05B 15/62 (2018.02); B05B 15/63 (2018.02); B05B 9/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108961 U1 20010816; EP 1262242 A2 20021204; EP 1262242 A3 20040804

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060411

2005-06-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MADEC-OTTO GMBH

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-04-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI