Global Patent Index - EP 1262315 A1

EP 1262315 A1 2002-12-04 - Method and apparatus for making a printing plate

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for making a printing plate

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Druckform

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression

Publication

EP 1262315 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112705 A

Priority

EP 01112705 A

Abstract (en)

A relief pattern is produced in the surface (2) of a polymeric type form preform by material removal from the surface. Material is burnt away by irradiation along paths. Different depths of relief area(A,B,C) are produced along the same path by repeated irradiation along the path. An Independent claim is made for the process equipment which has a laser for irradiating a surface (2) of the preform (1) and a laser control unit. Data files contain commands for switching laser beams on and off along a path and each file allows time-displaced operation of beams.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Herstellung einer Druckform wird in die Oberfläche eines Druckformrohlings (1) ein Relief dadurch eingebracht, daß Material des Druckformrohlings (1) entlang von Spuren durch Strahlung abgetragen wird. Zu diesem Zweck werden entlang jeweils ein und derselben Spur unterschiedlich tief liegende Reliefbereiche durch entsprechend häufiges Bestrahlen erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/05; B41B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/00 (2006.01); B41B 19/00 (2006.01); B41C 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41B 19/00 (2013.01); B41C 1/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262315 A1 20021204; EP 1262315 B1 20041117; EP 1262315 B8 20050105; AT 282526 T 20041215; CN 1208190 C 20050629; CN 1387996 A 20030101; DE 50104541 D1 20041223; ES 2233522 T3 20050616; HK 1052320 A1 20051209; JP 2003053928 A 20030226; JP 3556204 B2 20040818; US 2002195012 A1 20021226; US 6857365 B2 20050222

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140525

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 282526 T

- Effective date: 20140525

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-03-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SPGPRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH, LANGKAMPFEN, AT

- Document: DE 50104541

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50104541

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140123

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120508

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20081021

2009-05-06 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20081021

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH

- Free text: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH#KUFSTEINER STRASSE 4#6336 LANGKAMPFEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH#KUFSTEINER STRASSE 4#6336 LANGKAMPFEN (AT)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG., CO., LTD.

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-10-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG., CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233522 T3

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-05-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-02-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104541 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUFFINGER, JOSEF

2004-12-01 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KURZ, FRANZ

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUFFINGER, JOSEF

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KURZ, FRANZ

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STORK PRINTS AUSTRIA GMBH

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011112

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI