Global Patent Index - EP 1262418 A2

EP 1262418 A2 2002-12-04 - Postal container for printed product

Title (en)

Postal container for printed product

Title (de)

Versandverpackung für Druckerzeugnisse

Title (fr)

Emballage d'expédition pour produits imprimés

Publication

EP 1262418 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006775 A

Priority

DE 20105106 U

Abstract (en)

The mailing packaging (1) for printed products (2) comprises a stiff primary cover (3) and an enveloping secondary cover (9) which consists of a plastic foil and is provided with flat sealing seams (10) located at a level between the top and bottom sides of the primary cover. The sealing seams are provided with means (12) allowing them to be more easily torn for purposes of opening of the package.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Versandverpackung (1) für Druckerzeugnisse (2), mit einer das Druckerzeugnis (2) ganz oder teilweise umgebenden, flachen Primärhülle (3) aus Versteifungsmaterial und einer die Primärhülle (3) allseitig umgebenden Sekundärhülle (9) aus Kunststoffolie. Um eine derartige Versandverpackungen leichter öffnen zu können, ohne das verpackte Druckerzeugnis beim Öffnen zu beschädigen, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß die Sekundärhülle (9) als Folienbeutel aus Polypropylenfolie ausgebildet ist, der an mindestens einer Schmalseite mit einer nach außen vorstehenden flächigen Siegelnaht (10) versehen ist, deren Erstreckungsebene zwischen der Oberseite und der Unterseite der Primärhülle (3) liegt und die vorzugsweise am äußeren Rand mit Einreißhilfsmitteln (12) versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 77/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5816 (2013.01); B65D 77/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20204748 U1 20020704; EP 1262418 A2 20021204; EP 1262418 A3 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-04-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI