Global Patent Index - EP 1262421 A2

EP 1262421 A2 2002-12-04 - Multiple dispensing container

Title (en)

Multiple dispensing container

Title (de)

Mehrfachspendedose

Title (fr)

Boîte à medicaments multi-compartiments

Publication

EP 1262421 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010550 A

Priority

US 29186301 P

Abstract (en)

The multiple dispenser for tablets, capsules and similar objects is made up of assemblable individual dispensers consisting of top and bottom elements (1, 2) which are rotatable relative to one another for opening and closing a dispenser opening (5). The multiple dispenser further comprises cover elements (3a, 3b).

Abstract (de)

Die Mehrfachspendedose stellt eine Vorrichtung zum geordneten Aufbewahren und Spenden kleiner Artikel, wie Tabletten, etc dar. Eine Mehrfachspendedose setzt sich aus zumindest einer Spendedose (Abbildung A) zusammen. Einzelne Spendedosen (Abbildung A) können in beliebiger Anzahl zu einer Mehrfachspendedose zusammengesetzt werden (Abbildung A.a). Eine Spendedose (Abbildung A) besteht aus zwei Teilen (1 und 2). Durch entgegengesetzte Drehung der beiden Teile (1 und 2) werden die an der Seite befindlichen Spendeöffnungen (5) freigegeben. Das Öffnen und Schließen der Spendeöffnungen (5) kann nur durch Drehung in eine Richtung erfolgen. Ober- (1) und Unterteil (2) rasten in den Stellungen der Dose "Offen" und "Geschlossen" ein. Der Innenraum einer Spendedose wird durch einen an einem der beiden Teile befestigten Innenteil (6) in mehrere Fächer unterteilt. Die Fächer können der Größe und Anzahl nach jeweils den zur Aufbewahrung bestimmten Artikeln angepasst werden. Durch Prägungen kann die Dose auch durch bloßes Greifen, bzw. von Sehbehinderten verwendet werden. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/04; B65D 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/08 (2006.01); B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0454 (2013.01); B65D 21/083 (2013.01); B65D 2583/0413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262421 A2 20021204; EP 1262421 A3 20021211; US 2002190075 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1053095

2004-06-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030217

- Countries: AL

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030217

- Countries: LT

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030217

- Countries: LV

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030217

- Countries: MK

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030217

- Countries: RO

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030217

- Countries: SI

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI