Global Patent Index - EP 1262582 A1

EP 1262582 A1 2002-12-04 - Device for feeding a leno yarn in a weaving loom

Title (en)

Device for feeding a leno yarn in a weaving loom

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bereitstellen eines Dreherfadens für eine Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fournir un fil de tour à un métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1262582 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405144 A

Priority

  • EP 02405144 A
  • EP 01810308 A

Abstract (en)

A leno-thread supplying apparatus comprises a holding device for accommodating at least two leno-thread bobbins, and a shaft having a thread-guiding passage which opens towards the holding device. The thread-guiding passage is designed in a manner that both leno warp threads passing through can be supplied to a thread-guiding element. A leno-thread supplying apparatus (1) consists of a shaft (4), a holding device (6) and a thread-guiding element (8). The holding device is designed for accommodating at least two leno-thread bobbins (2, 3). It is rotatably connected to the shaft and includes holding mechanism (7) for rotation-free holding of the holding device. The shaft is rotatably provided about an axis of rotation and has an active connection to a drive apparatus (5) for setting the shaft in rotation. The shaft has a thread-guiding passage and is designed in a manner such that both leno warp threads (2a, 3a) passing through can be supplied to the thread-guiding element. The thread-guiding element is firmly connected to the shaft.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung (1) zum Bereitstellen eines Dreherfadens (2a, 3a) für eine Webmaschine, umfasst eine um eine Drehachse (A) drehbar gelagerte Welle (4), welche eine Wirkverbindung zu einer Antriebsvorrichtung (5) aufweist, um die Welle (4) in Rotation zu versetzen, sowie eine Haltevorrichtung (6) zur Aufnahme einer Dreherfadenspule (2,3), wobei die Haltevorrichtung (6) drehbar mit der Welle (4) verbunden ist, sowie ein Haltemittel (7) zum im wesentlichen verdrehfreien Halten der Haltevorrichtung (6), sowie ein Fadenführungselement (8) welches fest mit der Welle (4) verbunden ist, wobei die Haltevorrichtung (6) zur Aufnahme von zumindest zwei Dreherfadenspulen (2,3) ausgestaltet ist, und die Welle (4) einen Fadenführungskanal (4a) aufweist, welcher zur Haltevorrichtung (6) mündet, und welcher derart ausgestaltet ist, dass beide Dreherkettfäden (2a, 3a) durch den Fadenführungskanal (4a) verlaufend dem Fadenführungselement (8) zuführbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 7/08; D03C 7/04; D03D 51/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 7/04 (2006.01); D03C 7/08 (2006.01); D03D 51/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 7/08 (2013.01); D03C 7/04 (2013.01); D03D 51/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262582 A1 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090901

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI