Global Patent Index - EP 1262598 A2

EP 1262598 A2 2002-12-04 - Railway switch

Title (en)

Railway switch

Title (de)

Gleisweiche

Title (fr)

Aiguillage de voies ferrées

Publication

EP 1262598 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006446 A

Priority

DE 10126212 A

Abstract (en)

The pump (36) has a connection to an electric power supply (34) and has several pump bodies supplying oil to a set of flow dividers (40) connected to a number of lubrication devices (42). Each sliding support (22) for a point tongue (20) has an oil channel (44) with a connection (46) to one of the flow dividers. The channel debouches into an X-shaped groove (48) which assists in distributing the oil.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Gleisweiche (10) mit einer Weichenzunge (20) beschrieben, die auf Gleitstühlen (22) verstellbeweglich vorgesehen ist. Die Gleitstühle (22) sind mit einer zentralen Schmiereinrichtung (26) verbunden, um eine automatische optimale Schmierung zwischen der Weichenzunge (20) und den Gleitstühlen (22) der Gleisweiche (10) zu erzielen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262598 A2 20021204; EP 1262598 A3 20030917; DE 10126212 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI