Global Patent Index - EP 1262620 A1

EP 1262620 A1 2002-12-04 - Tensioning device for cable of vehicle window regulator

Title (en)

Tensioning device for cable of vehicle window regulator

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung eines Kabels für Fensterheber eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien de câble pour lève-vitre de véhicule

Publication

EP 1262620 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291311 A

Priority

FR 0106994 A

Abstract (en)

The cable operated motor vehicle window actuator (1) has a cursor (2) driven by the cable (7) and cable return rollers (5,6) mounted on axes (10). A tensioner (11,12) is mounted on each axis to directly operate the cable. Each tensioner has a groove to receive the cable and a projection to hold the cable in the groove. The tensioner can be a leaf spring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/485 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/654 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/66 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/342 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/344 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262620 A1 20021204; EP 1262620 B1 20040804; DE 60200853 D1 20040909; DE 60200853 T2 20050818; ES 2227404 T3 20050401; FR 2825407 A1 20021206; FR 2825407 B1 20040213

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-03-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200853

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS-FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS-FRANCE, SULLY SUR LOIRE, FR

- Document: DE 60200853

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200853

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200853

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227404 T3

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200853 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI