Global Patent Index - EP 1262624 A1

EP 1262624 A1 2002-12-04 - Drive for adjusting multiple lamellae of a blind

Title (en)

Drive for adjusting multiple lamellae of a blind

Title (de)

Antrieb zum Verstellen von mehreren Sonnenschutzlamellen

Title (fr)

Méchanisme pour pivoter des lamelles d'une protection solaire

Publication

EP 1262624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02011314 A

Priority

DE 10125934 A

Abstract (en)

Each vertical lamella (1) is attached to a bevel wheel (6) at its top end. The lamellae have bearings at their top and bottom ends mounted on sliders (12,26) moving in C-section housings (2). The bevel gears on the lamellae engage with bevel gears (5) on a shaft (16) with a continuous longitudinal keyway. There are gear drives (11,23) in the top and bottom housings for moving the sliders.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Antrieb zum Verstellen von mehreren Sonnenschutzlamellen, der das Verfahren der letzten aus der Beschattungsposition in ein kompaktes Paket an einer vorgegebenen Stelle ermöglicht, und zwar so dass die Lamellen in jeder Position, gegen anfallende Windkräfte und andere äußere Einwirkungen gehalten sind. Die Erfindung sieht vor, dass jede Lamelle (1) an einem Antriebswagen (12, 26) befestigt ist, der in einer Führungsschiene (2) geführt ist und in dem ein Zahnradgetriebe (23) montiert ist, bei dem das Antriebszahnrad (8, 24) mittels einer Keilwelle (15) von einem für alle Lamellen gemeinsamen Rotationsantrieb angetrieben wird und das Abtriebszahnrad (7, 25) in Form einer mit einer Außenverzahnung versehener Gewindemutter ausgeführt ist, die mit dem Außengewinde einer in der Führungsschiene montierten Gewindespindel (13) kämmt, wobei ist das Getriebe in jedem Antriebswagen so ausgelegt, dass die Drehgeschwindigkeit der Gewindemutter proportional der von der jeweiligen Lamelle zurückzulegenden Strecke zwischen den Endpositionen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/096; E06B 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/096 (2006.01); E06B 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/096 (2013.01); E04F 10/10 (2013.01); E06B 9/368 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262624 A1 20021204; DE 10125934 C1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040617

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030526

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI