Global Patent Index - EP 1262652 A2

EP 1262652 A2 2002-12-04 - Cylinder head with injector

Title (en)

Cylinder head with injector

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf und daran montierter Injektor

Title (fr)

Culasse avec injecteur

Publication

EP 1262652 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100564 A

Priority

DE 10126336 A

Abstract (en)

The cylinder head (Z) with an injector (I) comprises means allowing the injector to be clamped against the cylinder head, and a damping element (D1) which is located between the injector and the cylinder head. The materials of the damping element include plastics, graphite and a metal with shape memory.

Abstract (de)

Es ist ein Mittel zum Spannen vorgesehen, durch das der Injektor (I) an mindestens einer Anschlußstelle gegen den Zylinderkopf (Z) gespannt ist. An der Anschlußstelle zwischen dem Injektor (I) und dem Zylinderkopf (Z) ist ein erstes Dämpfungselement (D1) angeordnet, das im wesentlichen aus einem der Materialien Graphit, Polyformaldehyd, Polytetrafluorethylen, Memorymetall besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/24; F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02F 1/242 (2013.01); F02M 2200/09 (2013.01); F02M 2200/306 (2013.01); F02M 2200/85 (2013.01); F02M 2200/855 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262652 A2 20021204; EP 1262652 A3 20030730; EP 1262652 B1 20060726; DE 10126336 A1 20021212; DE 50207596 D1 20060907

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140528

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140528

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207596

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140528

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207596

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207596 P 20060907

2006-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2004-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI