Global Patent Index - EP 1262660 A2

EP 1262660 A2 2002-12-04 - Apparatus for controlling the power supply of a vehicle

Title (en)

Apparatus for controlling the power supply of a vehicle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Energieversorgung eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de l'alimentation d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1262660 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02012142 A

Priority

DE 10127053 A

Abstract (en)

The control device uses signal processing for combining at least 2 signals (18,20), respectively used for controlling the energy supply of at least one electrical load within the automobile and allowing starting of the automobile engine, the combined signal fed to a switch (26) for disconnection of the load during the starting of the engine.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Energieversorgung eines Kraftfahrzeugs vorgeschlagen, mit zumindest einer Signalverarbeitung (21, 26, 28, 29, 30, 41), der zumindest ein erstes Signal (18) und ein zweites Signal (20) zugeführt sind, wobei über eines der Signale (20) der Startvorgang des Kraftfahrzeugs einleitbar ist, über das zweite Signal (18) die Energieversorgung zumindest eines im Kraftfahrzeug angeordneten Verbrauchers beeinflussbar ist, wobei die Signalverarbeitung (21, 26, 28, 29, 30, 41) die Signale (18, 20) verknüpft zur Erzeugung eines Ansteuersignals für zumindest ein Schaltmittel (26, 43), über welches zumindest ein Verbraucher geschaltet ist, der während des Startvorgangs des Kraftfahrzeugs deaktiviert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/0803 (2013.01); F02N 11/087 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 10011410 A1 20010920 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262660 A2 20021204; EP 1262660 A3 20051123; DE 10127053 A1 20021205

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-03-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI