Global Patent Index - EP 1262713 A1

EP 1262713 A1 2002-12-04 - Arrangement for fastening a light screening device on a reflector and headlamp comprising the same

Title (en)

Arrangement for fastening a light screening device on a reflector and headlamp comprising the same

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Befestigung einer Lichtblende auf einem Reflektor und mit einer solchen Anordnung ausgerüsteter Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Agencement pour la fixation d'un dispositif d'occultation sur un réflecteur et projecteur équipé d'un tel agencement

Publication

EP 1262713 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291292 A

Priority

FR 0107197 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp assembly includes a component for shielding the light falling on to the reflector. The light shield (12) comprises a shielding cowl (36) and at least two support arms (38,40) extending from the cowl axially towards the rear. Each support arm is attached to the edge of the hole in the reflector through which lamp is fitted. The headlamp assembly includes a component for shielding the light falling on to the reflector. The reflector has a concave reflecting front surface, and a hole for the mounting of a lamp along its principal axis. The light shield (12) is mounted in front of the reflector and comprises a shielding cowl (36) and at least two support arms (38,40) extending from the cowl axially towards the rear. Each support arm has, at its free end, a fitting (62,64) which co-operates with a complementary shaped element on the reflector. The arms may be metallic and have elasticity to assist their retention in the reflector. This provides a secure mounting for the shield within the hole in the reflector, such that the cowl of the shield is situated around the lamp.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00; F21V 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/435 (2018.01); F21S 41/47 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0972984 A2 20000119 - HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262713 A1 20021204; FR 2825447 A1 20021206; FR 2825447 B1 20040109

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061206

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI