Global Patent Index - EP 1262825 A1

EP 1262825 A1 2002-12-04 - Film material exhibiting a "colder" blue-black image tone and improved preservation characteristics

Title (en)

Film material exhibiting a "colder" blue-black image tone and improved preservation characteristics

Title (de)

Filmmaterial, das einen "kälteren" blauschwarzen Bildton und verbesserte Lagerungseigenschaften aufweist

Title (fr)

Pellicule photographique ayant un ton de l'image noir bleuâtre "plus froid" et des propriétés de stockage améliorées

Publication

EP 1262825 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02100546 A

Priority

  • EP 02100546 A
  • EP 01000178 A

Abstract (en)

A black-and-white silver halide photographic film material has been provided, wherein said material has first and second major surfaces, at least one of which is coated with at least one light-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer, overcoated with a protective antistress layer, wherein said emulsion layer(s) have chemically and spectrally sensitized ä111ü tabular hexagonal emulsion grains or crystals rich in silver bromide in an amount covering at least 50 % of the total projective grain surface of all grains, wherein said grains further have an average equivalent volume diameter in the range from 0.3 mu m up to 1.5 mu m and an average grain thickness of less than 0.30 mu m, and an average amount of iodide from 0.05 mole % up to 0.5 mole % based on silver over the whole grain volume, characterized in that said material comprises, in an amount of at least 0.5 mmole per mole of silver halide coated, a heteroaromatic compound according to the general formula (I), presented in the claims and in the detailed description.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/76; G03C 1/005; G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03535 + G03C 2001/03558
  2. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/03 + G03C 2001/03535
  3. G03C 1/7614 + G03C 2001/7635 + G03C 2200/33 + G03C 2200/40

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262825 A1 20021204; EP 1262825 B1 20050427

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120522

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60203848

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120522

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60203848 P 20050602

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELST, KATHY GABY

2005-04-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOCCUFIER, JOHAN

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI