Global Patent Index - EP 1262934 A2

EP 1262934 A2 2002-12-04 - Method to detect a traffic situation

Title (en)

Method to detect a traffic situation

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verkehrslageerfassung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la detection de la situation du trafic routier

Publication

EP 1262934 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02076700 A

Priority

DE 10126872 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves the following steps: (a) determination of the positions of motor vehicles (b) determination of the corresponding speeds of vehicles (c) determination of a traffic situation criterion from the captured data (d) determination of a limiting velocity (e) comparison of measured vehicle velocities with the limiting velocity (f) determination of the traffic situation criterion by assignment of a given value to the traffic, i.e. free-flowing, if traffic velocity exceeds the limit velocity.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Verkehrslageerfassung auf Straßen durch Datenerfassung mittels Sensoren und Datenauswertung anhand von Parametern. Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren ist insbesondere für Verkehrslageerfassung in Ballungsräumen geeignet. Bei dem Verfahren werden die Fahrzeugposition und die dem jeweiligen Landfahrzeug zugeordnete Fahrzeuggeschwindigkeit von Landfahrzeugen erfaßt. Ein Verkehrszustand-Kriterium wird ermittelt. Dabei wird eine bestimmte, von Null abweichende Grenzgeschwindigkeit festgelegt. Die Fahrzeuggeschwindigkeit wird mit dieser Grenzgeschwindigkeit verglichen. Ein bestimmter Wert des Verkehrszustand-Kriteriums wird dem Überschreiten der Grenzgeschwindigkeit zugeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/123 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/20 (2013.01); G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262934 A2 20021204; EP 1262934 A3 20031105; EP 1262934 B1 20070606; AT 364212 T 20070615; DE 10126872 A1 20030102; DE 50210258 D1 20070719; ES 2288535 T3 20080116

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180423

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210258

- Representative's name: WEISSE, JOERG, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2008-02-01 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2288535 T3

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070910

2007-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210258 P 20070719

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08G 1/01 20060101AFI20060731BHEP

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08G 1/123 20060101ALI20060731BHEP

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08G 1/01 A

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI