Global Patent Index - EP 1262941 A1

EP 1262941 A1 2002-12-04 - Method for implementing error diffusion on plasma display panel

Title (en)

Method for implementing error diffusion on plasma display panel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Durchführung von Fehlerdiffusion für eine Plasmaanzeigetafel

Title (fr)

Méthode de mise en oeuvre de traitement d'images par diffusion des erreurs pour un panneau d'affichage à plasma

Publication

EP 1262941 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01113011 A

Priority

EP 01113011 A

Abstract (en)

A method for implementing error diffusion on a plasma display panel (PDP) comprises the steps of performing an anti compensation process on a received video signal of the PDP; diffusing an error generated by a first one of a plurality of pixels to a plurality of adjacent pixels; absorbing errors generated by the plurality of adjacent pixels by the first pixel; and multiplying each of a plurality of numeric weightings and the error of each of the adjacent pixels to obtain an error function of the first pixel. This is effected in a cost effective while simple addition circuit for solving the problem of low level contouring in PDP due to insufficient gray scale of video signal in low gray scale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2059 (2013.01); G09G 3/2022 (2013.01); G09G 3/2077 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0266 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0271 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262941 A1 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071213

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI