Global Patent Index - EP 1263084 A2

EP 1263084 A2 2002-12-04 - Slot antenna

Title (en)

Slot antenna

Title (de)

Schlitzantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne à fente

Publication

EP 1263084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007611 A

Priority

DE 10126468 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a hollow feed conductor with at least one slot for radiating an electromagnetic wave and an arrangement enclosing the slot for rotating the polarization direction of the radiated electromagnetic wave with a rotatable rectangular hollow polarization conductor joined to the feed conductor at one opening and with an aperture at the other opening via which stimulated waves are radiated via the slot into the polarization conductor. The device has a hollow feed conductor (1) with at least one longitudinal slot (2) in one broad side for radiating an electromagnetic wave and an arrangement enclosing the slot on the outside with which the polarization direction of the radiated electromagnetic wave can be rotated. The arrangement has rotatable rectangular hollow polarization conductor (11) joined to the feed conductor at one opening and with an aperture at the other opening via which stimulated waves are radiated via the slot into the polarization conductor.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schlitzantenne bestehend aus einem sich in Längsrichtung erstreckenden Speisehohlleiter (1) zur Führung elektromagnetischer Wellen mit mindestens einem in einer Breitseite (4) des Speisehohlleiters (1) ausgebildeten Schlitz (2) zum Abstrahlen einer elektromagnetischen Welle, wobei der Schlitz (2) auf der Außenseite des Speisehohlleiters (1) von einer Anordnung umgeben ist, mittels der die Polarisationsrichtung der vom Schlitz (2) abgestrahlten elektromagnetischen Welle gedreht wird. Gemäß der Erfindung ist der Schlitz (2) in Längsrichtung des Speisehohlleiters (1) ausgebildet und die den Schlitz (2) umgebende Anordnung ist ein rechtwinkliger Polarisatorhohlleiter (11), der mit seiner einen Öffnung mit der Breitseite (4) des Speisehohlleiters (2) verbunden ist und an seiner anderen Öffnung eine Apertur aufweist, über die eine durch den Schlitz (2) in dem Polarisatorhohlleiter (11) angeregte Hohlleiterwelle abgestrahlt wird und der bezüglich des Schlitzes (2) derart ausgerichtet ist, dass eine Querachse (a) des Polarisatorhohlleiters (11) einen Winkel (α) mit der Längsachse des Schlitzes (2) bildet, wobei der Winkel (α) denjenigen Winkel darstellt, um den die Polarisation der aus dem Schlitz (2) in den Polarisatorhohlleiter (11) abgestrahlten elektromagnetischen Welle gedreht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 13/10; H01P 1/17; H01Q 13/02; H01Q 13/22; H01Q 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/17 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1263084 A2 20021204; EP 1263084 A3 20041110; DE 10126468 A1 20030102; DE 10126468 B4 20070705; JP 2003037432 A 20030207; JP 4065722 B2 20080326; US 2002190910 A1 20021219; US 6657599 B2 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151103

2014-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH

2005-07-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 13/10 A

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 13/02 B

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 21/00 B

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01P 1/17 B

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 13/22 B

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI