Global Patent Index - EP 1263094 A2

EP 1263094 A2 2002-12-04 - Bayonet type lamp holder with nut

Title (en)

Bayonet type lamp holder with nut

Title (de)

Bajonett-Lampenfassung mit Mutter

Title (fr)

Support de lampe à bayonette avec écrou

Publication

EP 1263094 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02386003 A

Priority

GR 2001100275 A

Abstract (en)

A lamp holder (socket) -bayonet type- with nut is used for internal and external lighting and is comprised of the main body -1a-, contact spikes -11-, the water-proof flange -12-, the cover -6-, the bolts -14-, the water-proof ring -13-. The lamp holder (socket) is placed on the cable -3-. The internal part of the cover has gabs -15-for its integration on the main body. On the main body the lamp -2-is screwed. On the cover thread -7- the nut -5- is screwed which has internal thread -5a- and a guide -5b- cramped in the profile or the wire -4-. The cover -6- is screwed on the main body with bolts -14-. The cover has internal arrangement -8- with scales -9-, -10- for the reception of the profile or the wire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1263094 A2 20021204; EP 1263094 A3 20040512; GR 1004698 B 20041011; GR 20010100275 A 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041113

2005-03-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI