Global Patent Index - EP 1263267 A2

EP 1263267 A2 2002-12-04 - Method for starting a discharge lamp

Title (en)

Method for starting a discharge lamp

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Start einer Entladungslampe

Title (fr)

Méthode d'amorçage d'une lampe à décharge

Publication

EP 1263267 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005924 A

Priority

DE 10126011 A

Abstract (en)

One of the two electrode filaments (W1,W2) of the low pressure discharge lamp is preheated in the preheating phase. A direct current and an alternating current flow through the discharge lamp during in respective sub-phases of the operation phases. <??>An Independent claim is included for discharge lamp starter.

Abstract (de)

In einer Vorheizphase wir nur eine Wendel vorgeheizt. Die nicht vorgeheizte Wendel wird nach der Zündung in einer kurzen Gleichstromphase als Anode aufgeheizt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/295; H05B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1263267 A2 20021204; EP 1263267 A3 20050601; EP 1263267 B1 20070502; CA 2383335 A1 20021128; DE 10126011 A1 20021205; DE 50210057 D1 20070614; US 2002175629 A1 20021128; US 6696791 B2 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120314

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210057

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2007-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210057 P 20070614

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-06-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 41/295 A

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 41/04 B

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI