Global Patent Index - EP 1263407 A1

EP 1263407 A1 2002-12-11 - HAIR CARE COMPOSITION CONTAINING POLYALKYLENEGLYCOL(n)ALKYLAMINE AND ORGANIC ACID

Title (en)

HAIR CARE COMPOSITION CONTAINING POLYALKYLENEGLYCOL(n)ALKYLAMINE AND ORGANIC ACID

Title (de)

HAARPFLEGEMITTEL ENTHALTEND EIN POLYALKYLENGLYCOL(N)ALKYLAMIN UND EINE ORGANISCHE SÄURE

Title (fr)

PREPARATIONS POUR SOINS CAPILLAIRES CONTENANT DE LA POLYALKYLENEGLYCOL(N)ALKYLAMINE ET UN ACIDE ORGANIQUE

Publication

EP 1263407 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00963372 A

Priority

  • US 0024965 W
  • US 0006665 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0168039A2] Disclosed are hair care compositions including a polyalkyleneglycol(n)alkylamine of formula (I), (II), or mixtures thereof, wherein each R is independently a saturated, unsaturated, straight or branched alkyl group having from 1 to about 30 carbon atoms, R' is a saturated, unsaturated, straight or branched alkyl group having from 1 to about 4 carbon atoms, each m is 2 or 3, each n is 2 or 3, each x and each y are independently a number of 1 or more wherein the sum of each x and each y is from about 3 to about 9; and wherein X- is any safe and suitable salt forming anion selected from the group consisting of chloride, bromide, iodide, acetate, citrate, lactate, glycolate, phosphate, nitrate, sulfonate, sulfate, alkylsulfate, alkyl sulfonate, glutamate aspartate, and mixtures thereof; and wherein the melting point of the polyalkyleneglycol(n)alkylamine is less than about 45 DEG C; and a gel matrix comprising a cationic surfactant, a solid fatty compound, and water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/50; A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/362 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/45 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/45 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0168051A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0168039 A2 20010920; WO 0168039 A3 20020131; AU 4356301 A 20010924; AU 7479600 A 20010924; CA 2398587 A1 20010920; CA 2398609 A1 20010920; CN 1418082 A 20030514; CN 1450889 A 20031022; EP 1263395 A2 20021211; EP 1263407 A1 20021211; JP 2003526645 A 20030909; JP 2003526652 A 20030909; MX 234468 B 20060215; MX PA02008894 A 20030210; MX PA02008896 A 20030801; WO 0168051 A1 20010920

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANG, JIAN-ZHONG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOONG, YUKIKO

2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANG, JIAN-ZHONG

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOONG, YUKIKO

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANG, JIAN-ZHONG

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOONG, YUKIKO

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANG, JIAN, ZHONG

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOONG, YUKIKO

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI