Global Patent Index - EP 1263539 A1

EP 1263539 A1 2002-12-11 - NON-CUTTING PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A COMPONENT WITH A HUB

Title (en)

NON-CUTTING PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A COMPONENT WITH A HUB

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SPANLOSEN HERSTELLUNG EINES BAUTEILS MIT NABE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION SANS ENLEVEMENT DE COPEAUX D'UN PIECE COMPORTANT UN MOYEU

Publication

EP 1263539 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01901192 A

Priority

  • DE 10006803 A
  • DE 10033089 A
  • EP 0100698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160543A1] The invention relates to a method for non-cutting production of a component, especially a component of a gearbox . Said component comprises a hub (15). The hub (15) is provided with a stepped hole (15) and is produced by cold deformation in a pressing process. A hub (15) extending in a substantially radial manner with respect to the plane of a round metal blank is produced from a rotating round metal blank (1), using at least one rotating pressing cylinder (11). The invention is characterized in that the pressure cylinder (11) is advanced into the round metal blank (1) at least periodically and in sections, whereupon it is inserted therein in a radial manner from an outer position to an inner position. A material web (15) forming the stepped hole (17) and extending substantially inwards from the hub (15) is embodied on the inner periphery of the hub (15), characterized in that when the hub (15) is deformed, at least one section of an attachment (7) is arranged at a distance from the round metal blank (1). As the hub is formed (15), material from the round metal blank flows into the area between the round metal blank (1) and said section of the attachment (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/16; B21D 53/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 1/00 (2006.01); B21D 22/16 (2006.01); B21D 53/26 (2006.01); B21H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/16 (2013.01); B21D 53/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160543A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160543 A1 20010823; CA 2399102 A1 20010823; CA 2399102 C 20090203; DE 50107363 D1 20051013; EP 1263539 A1 20021211; EP 1263539 B1 20050907; ES 2244580 T3 20051216; JP 2003522645 A 20030729; JP 3787092 B2 20060621

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244580 T3

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050927

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107363 P 20051013

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NON-CUTTING PRODUCTION METHOD FOR A COMPONENT WITH A HUB

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR