Global Patent Index - EP 1263657 A1

EP 1263657 A1 2002-12-11 - MOLDED CLOSURE WITH FLEX AREAS AND METHOD

Title (en)

MOLDED CLOSURE WITH FLEX AREAS AND METHOD

Title (de)

GEFORMTER VERSCHLUSS MIT FLEXIBLEN ZONEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DESSELBEN

Title (fr)

BOUCHON MOULE ET DOTE DE ZONES FLEXIBLES, ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1263657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00965043 A

Priority

  • US 0025338 W
  • US 18986900 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0170586A1] A plastic cap (10) having a top portion and a skirt (12) with an interior surface. There are weak areas, flex areas (14) or flex panels, preferably in the interior surface of the skirt (12), to allow the skirt to expand circumferentially radially outward when the interior surface of the skirt (12) is subjected to a radially outwardly directed force as during strip-ejection of the cap from mold tooling (38). A method of molding the strip ejectable cap (10) includes providing outwardly extending members (42) on the core (38) of the mold tooling to form areas (14) in the cap that are thinner than the average thickness of the cap to allow the cap to expand radially outward when the cap is strip ejected from the mold tooling (38) with reduced smearing of the thread.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/17; B29C 45/40; B29C 45/44; B65D 41/04; B65D 50/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/00 (2006.01); B29C 45/44 (2006.01); B65D 41/02 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B29L 31/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2013.01); B29C 45/0081 (2013.01); B29C 45/4407 (2013.01); B29L 2031/565 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0170586 A1 20010927; AU 2000275831 B2 20051215; AU 7583100 A 20011003; BR 0017167 A 20030429; CA 2401029 A1 20010927; CN 1270940 C 20060823; CN 1450970 A 20031022; EP 1263657 A1 20021211; EP 1263657 A4 20041117; JP 2003528010 A 20030924; MX PA02008932 A 20030425; RU 2002127730 A 20040320; ZA 200206837 B 20030227

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050525

2004-11-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 41/17 A

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 50/08 B

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 45/40 B

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 41/04 B

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 45/44 B

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI