Global Patent Index - EP 1263816 A1

EP 1263816 A1 2002-12-11 - PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE AND A SMALL AMOUNT OF A DIENE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE AND A SMALL AMOUNT OF A DIENE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISATION VON ETHYLEN MIT EINER KLEINEN MENGE EINES DIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE UTILISANT UNE PETITE QUANTITE DE DIENE

Publication

EP 1263816 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01905317 A

Priority

  • US 0103273 W
  • US 50700700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162808A1] Disclosed is a polymerization process utilizing a low level of diene to control the polymer product's melt index ratio independently of the melt index and density. The process of the invention produces polymers with enhanced processability. More specifically the process produces ethylene based polymers, prepared in gas phase polymerization processes utilizing bulky ligand metallocene polymerization catalysts, having enhanced melt strength and shear-thinning behaviour.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 210/18; C08F 2/34; C08F 210/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/34 (2006.01); C08F 4/642 (2006.01); C08F 4/6592 (2006.01); C08F 10/02 (2006.01); C08F 210/02 (2006.01); C08F 210/18 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 210/18 (2013.01); C08F 210/02 (2013.01); C08F 4/65912 (2013.01); C08F 4/65927 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 210/02 + C08F 236/20 + C08F 2500/12 + C08F 2500/26 + C08F 2500/11 + C08F 2500/09
  2. C08F 210/18 + C08F 210/14 + C08F 2500/12 + C08F 2500/26 + C08F 2500/11 + C08F 2500/09

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162808A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162808 A1 20010830; AU 3321001 A 20010903; BR 0108563 A 20021112; CA 2400665 A1 20010830; EP 1263816 A1 20021211; JP 2003524038 A 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZHANG, X., SIMON

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LITTEER, DWAYNE, L.

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZHANG, X., SIMON

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LITTEER, DWAYNE, L.

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR