Global Patent Index - EP 1263960 A2

EP 1263960 A2 2002-12-11 - ANTI-TISSUE FACTOR ANTIBODIES WITH ENHANCED ANTICOAGULANT POTENCY

Title (en)

ANTI-TISSUE FACTOR ANTIBODIES WITH ENHANCED ANTICOAGULANT POTENCY

Title (de)

ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN GEWEBEFAKTOR (TF) MIT ERHÖHTER ANTIKOAGULIERENDER WIRKUNG

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS ANTI FACTEUR TISSULAIRE A POUVOIR ANTICOAGULANT AMELIORE

Publication

EP 1263960 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01924131 A

Priority

  • US 0107501 W
  • US 18977500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0170984A2] The invention concerns anti-tissue factor (anti-TF) antibodies with enhanced anticoagulant potency, and methods and means for identifying, producing and using such antibodies. The anti-TF antibodies of the present invention are designed to comprise a region binding to an epitope in the C-terminal macromolecular substrate binding region of TF.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/13; A61K 39/395; A61P 7/00; A61P 31/00; C07K 16/28; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/62; C12N 15/70; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/36 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/13 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/36 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2299/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/24 (2013.01); C07K 2317/54 (2013.01); C07K 2317/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0170984A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0170984 A2 20010927; WO 0170984 A3 20020228; AU 2001250814 B2 20070215; AU 5081401 A 20011003; CA 2402596 A1 20010927; EP 1263960 A2 20021211; JP 2003527861 A 20030924

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049184

2010-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090820

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051021

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051021

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI