Global Patent Index - EP 1263976 A1

EP 1263976 A1 2002-12-11 - EXPRESSION OF AN ANTIMICROBIAL PEPTIDE VIA THE PLASTID GENOME TO CONTROL PHYTOPATHOGENIC BACTERIA

Title (en)

EXPRESSION OF AN ANTIMICROBIAL PEPTIDE VIA THE PLASTID GENOME TO CONTROL PHYTOPATHOGENIC BACTERIA

Title (de)

EXPRESSION EINES ANTIMIKROBIELLEN PEPTIDS üBER DAS PLASTIDGENOM ZUR KONTROLLE PHYTOPATHOGENER BAKTERIEN

Title (fr)

EXPRESSION D'UN PEPTIDE ANTIMICROBIEN VIA GENOME PLASTIDE POUR ELIMINER LES BACTERIES PHYTOPATHOGENES

Publication

EP 1263976 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01913116 A

Priority

  • US 0106287 W
  • US 18566200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0164927A1] This invention provides a novel method to confer disease resistance to plants. Plant plastids are transformed using a plastid vector which contains heterologous DNA sequences coding for a cytotoxic antimicrobial peptide. Transgenic plants are capable of fighting off phytopathogenic bacterial infection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C12N 5/04; C12N 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8214 (2013.01); C12N 15/8281 (2013.01); C12N 15/8282 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0164927 A1 20010907; WO 0164927 B1 20020207; AU 4181301 A 20010912; CA 2401957 A1 20010907; EP 1263976 A1 20021211; EP 1263976 A4 20041201; NZ 521660 A 20040528

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110118

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-12-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041019

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020927

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI