Global Patent Index - EP 1264082 A2

EP 1264082 A2 2002-12-11 - LIQUID FILTER, ESPECIALLY OIL FILTER

Title (en)

LIQUID FILTER, ESPECIALLY OIL FILTER

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTER, INSBESONDERE ÖLFILTER

Title (fr)

FILTRE POUR LIQUIDE, NOTAMMENT FILTRE A HUILE

Publication

EP 1264082 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01911399 A

Priority

  • DE 0100351 W
  • DE 10012461 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10012461A1] The oil filter (1) has an annular filter insert inside the filter, separating the clean side from the input side. The filter has a metal casing (2) with a first flange (3) for screwing it to a component with input, output and a relatively unpressurized idling line. The flange has an axial outer seal (24) for these. There is a carrier insert (23) in a recess (22) open to input, output and idling cavities.

[origin: DE10012461A1] The oil filter (1) has an annular filter insert inside the filter, separating the clean side from the input side. The filter has a metal casing (2) with a first flange (3) for screwing it to a component with input, output and a relatively unpressurized idling line. The flange has an axial outer seal (24) for these. There is a carrier insert (23) in a recess (22) open to input, output and idling cavities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 5/00 (2006.01); B01D 35/02 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 2011/033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0169050A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10012461 A1 20010920; BR 0109199 A 20021210; BR 0109199 B1 20091201; EP 1264082 A2 20021211; EP 1264082 B1 20040107; JP 2003527952 A 20030924; JP 4800545 B2 20111026; MX PA02008660 A 20030224; US 2003019462 A1 20030130; US 6833066 B2 20041221; WO 0169050 A2 20010920; WO 0169050 A3 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101296 P 20040212

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR