Global Patent Index - EP 1264102 A1

EP 1264102 A1 2002-12-11 - CAPSULE FOR AN INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

CAPSULE FOR AN INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

KAPSEL FÜR EIN EINSPRITZSYSTEM

Title (fr)

CAPSULE POUR SYSTEME D'INJECTION

Publication

EP 1264102 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915244 A

Priority

  • DE 10012834 A
  • EP 0101616 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10012834A1] A fuel injection system for an IC engine comprising a fuel distribution pipe (1), fuel inlet and outlet and injection valves (5) has all these components enclosed in a housing (12) which is impermeable to hydrocarbons.

[origin: DE10012834A1] A fuel injection system for an IC engine comprising a fuel distribution pipe (1), fuel inlet and outlet and injection valves (5) has all these components enclosed in a housing (12) which is impermeable to hydrocarbons.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/00; F02M 35/104; F02M 63/02; F02M 69/04; F02M 69/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/145 (2013.01); F02M 69/465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0169077A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10012834 A1 20010927; EP 1264102 A1 20021211; EP 1264102 B1 20051221; WO 0169077 A1 20010920

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080214

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080215

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080214

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070301

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-02-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060108

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108461 P 20060126

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI SE

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI