Global Patent Index - EP 1264180 A2

EP 1264180 A2 2002-12-11 - SENSOR ELEMENT FOR OPTICALLY DETECTING CHEMICAL OR BIOCHEMICAL ANALYTES

Title (en)

SENSOR ELEMENT FOR OPTICALLY DETECTING CHEMICAL OR BIOCHEMICAL ANALYTES

Title (de)

SENSORELEMENT ZUR OPTISCHEN DETEKTION VON CHEMISCHEN ODER BIOCHEMISCHEN ANALYTEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT CAPTEUR POUR LA DETECTION OPTIQUE D'ANALYTES CHIMIQUES OU BIOCHIMIQUES

Publication

EP 1264180 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01916889 A

Priority

  • DE 0100672 W
  • DE 10012793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10012793A1] Sensor for optical detection of chemical or biochemical analytes comprises feeding samples containing the analyte into separate cavities (4) where they are subjected to an evanescent field produced by total reflection from the surface of the sample. Sensor for optical detection of chemical or biochemical analytes comprises feeding samples containing the analyte into separate cavities (4) where they are subjected to an evanescent field produced by total reflection from the surface of the sample. The cavities are positioned in a structured coating (3) on a substrate (2) and the thickness of the coating is greater than the depth of penetration of the field. It is made from a fluorinated polymer. Independent claims are included for the following: (1) making the sensor comprising coating a substrate with fluorinated polymer and forming the cavities by photolithography; and (2) optical detection of analytes using the sensors in which light emitted from the individual samples in each cavity is separately detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; G01N 21/55

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 21/552 (2014.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/648 (2013.01); G01N 21/253 (2013.01); G01N 21/553 (2013.01); G01N 33/54373 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0169256A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10012793 A1 20010927; DE 10012793 C2 20020124; AU 4407101 A 20010924; EP 1264180 A2 20021211; JP 2003531361 A 20031021; US 2003132406 A1 20030717; WO 0169256 A2 20010920; WO 0169256 A3 20020411

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI