Global Patent Index - EP 1264307 A1

EP 1264307 A1 2002-12-11 - DATA MEMORY

Title (en)

DATA MEMORY

Title (de)

DATENSPEICHER

Title (fr)

MEMOIRE DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1264307 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01923579 A

Priority

  • DE 10008328 A
  • EP 0101710 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163604A1] A data memory (1) has an optical information support which has a polymer film (11) that is wound into several layers (10) in a spiral shape. Information from a preselected layer (10) of the polymer film can be read out through said polymer film and optionally, written into a preselected layer of the polymer film (10). A lacquer layer (12) which is configured in the form of an adhesion layer is situated between adjacent polymer film layers (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/24; G11B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/26 (2006.01); G11B 7/0025 (2006.01); G11B 7/004 (2006.01); G11B 7/24 (2013.01); G11B 7/245 (2006.01); G11B 7/256 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01); G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/246 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/256 (2013.01); G11B 7/0025 (2013.01); G11B 7/24 (2013.01); G11B 7/245 (2013.01); G11B 7/246 (2013.01); G11B 2007/0013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163604A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163604 A1 20010830; DE 10008328 A1 20020131; EP 1264307 A1 20021211; JP 2004500678 A 20040108; US 2003142619 A1 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA SCRIBOS GMBH

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA SCRIBOS GMBH

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EML EUROPEAN MEDIA LABORATORY GMBH

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUESSIG, BERNHARD

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEIBER, JOERN

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NOEHTE, STEFFEN

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR