Global Patent Index - EP 1264323 A1

EP 1264323 A1 2002-12-11 - ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY CONTACTOR, WITH A CONTACT BRIDGE SUPPORT LOCK

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY CONTACTOR, WITH A CONTACT BRIDGE SUPPORT LOCK

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHALTGERÄT, INSBESONDERE SCHÜTZ, MIT EINER KONTAKTBRÜCKENTRÄGERVERRIEGELUNG

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE, EN PARTICULIER CONTACTEUR, DOTE D'UN VERROUILLAGE DE SUPPORT DE PONT DE CONTACT

Publication

EP 1264323 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915079 A

Priority

  • DE 0100830 W
  • DE 10013319 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0169623A1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic switching device, especially a contactor, comprising a base (1), an arc chamber (2) removable from the base (1), a contact bridge support (4) and a spring-loaded locking element (5). The contact bridge support (4) projects into the arc chamber (2) and can be displaced in a direction of actuation (x). The contact bridge support can be locked by means of the locking element (5) when the arc chamber (2) is taken off. The locking element (5) is configured as a lever that is swiveled about a swiveling axis (10) which extends in perpendicular to the direction of actuation (x).

[origin: WO0169623A1] Ein elektromagnetisches Schaltgerät, insbesondere ein Schütz, weist ein Unterteil (1), eine vom Unterteil (1) abnehmbare Lichtbogenkammer (2), einen Kontaktbrückenträger (4) und ein federbelastetes Sperrelement (5) auf. Der Kontaktbrückenträger (4) ragt in die Lichtbogenkammer (2) hinein und ist in einer Betätigungsrichtung (x) verschiebbar. Er ist bei abgenommener Lichtbogenkammer (2) mittels des Sperrelements (5) verriegelbar. Dieses ist als um eine Schwenkachse (10) schwenkbarer Hebel ausgebildet. Die Schwenkachse (10) verläuft dabei senkrecht zur Betätigungsrichtung (x).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/345 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0169623A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0169623 A1 20010920; CN 1186791 C 20050126; CN 1398418 A 20030219; DE 10013319 C1 20011011; DE 50111278 D1 20061130; EP 1264323 A1 20021211; EP 1264323 B1 20061018; US 2003038694 A1 20030227; US 6750746 B2 20040615

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140305

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111278

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111278

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111278 P 20061130

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-06-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR