Global Patent Index - EP 1264362 A1

EP 1264362 A1 2002-12-11 - FIXING ELEMENT FOR A FOCUSING COMPONENT

Title (en)

FIXING ELEMENT FOR A FOCUSING COMPONENT

Title (de)

HALTERUNG FÜR EIN FOCUSSIERENDES BAUTEIL

Title (fr)

FIXATION POUR UN COMPOSANT DE FOCALISATION

Publication

EP 1264362 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01913565 A

Priority

  • DE 0100422 W
  • DE 10008269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163691A1] The invention relates to a fixing element for a focusing component (1), said component (1) being fixed by connecting elements to an object and having components (2, 3, 4) which can be focused on a predetermined signal axis. A fixing plate (5) with flexible flaps (6, 7) is attached between the component (1) and the object onto which said component is to be fixed. The flexible flaps provide the mechanical contact between the component (1) and the object, thus permitting the height tolerances of the component (1) to be compensated during operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; G01S 7/03; H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/3283 (2013.01); H01Q 1/12 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3233 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163691A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163691 A1 20010830; DE 10008269 A1 20010906; DE 10008269 C2 20020131; EP 1264362 A1 20021211; EP 1264362 B1 20030827; JP 2003524974 A 20030819; US 2003142025 A1 20030731; US 7164390 B2 20070116

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-12-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100559 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR