Global Patent Index - EP 1264392 A2

EP 1264392 A2 2002-12-11 - SWITCHING POWER SUPPLY

Title (en)

SWITCHING POWER SUPPLY

Title (de)

SCHALTNETZTEIL

Title (fr)

ALIMENTATION A DECOUPAGE

Publication

EP 1264392 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01909912 A

Priority

  • FR 0100568 W
  • FR 0002547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2805678A1] The invention concerns the field of switching power supply. More particularly, it concerns a switching power supply comprising means (2) to be connected to the mains supply (1) and a DC/DC converter (19) and comprising a operating mode and a standby mode, also including a capacitive circuit (20) placed in series between the connecting means (2) and the converter (19), the circuit capacitance being determined to substantially reduce the voltage (Ue) at the converter (19) input, and a switch (21) connected parallel to the capacitive circuit (20), the switch (21) being open in standby mode and closed in operating mode. The invention is particularly applicable to induction cooktops, in television sets, in computers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02M 3/24; H02M 7/217; H02M 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2805678 A1 20010831; FR 2805678 B1 20020628; AU 3750501 A 20010912; EP 1264392 A2 20021211; WO 0165674 A2 20010907; WO 0165674 A3 20020510

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

2015-05-06 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20140411

2015-05-06 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20150701

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090422

2008-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI