Global Patent Index - EP 1264566 A2

EP 1264566 A2 2002-12-11 - Flower-pot holder for open-air cultivation

Title (en)

Flower-pot holder for open-air cultivation

Title (de)

Blumentopfhalter für die Freilandpflanzenzucht

Title (fr)

Dispositif destiné à recevoir les pots de fleurs pour la culture en plein air

Publication

EP 1264566 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076936 A

Priority

IT MI20011050 A

Abstract (en)

A universal, wind-proof potholder for open-air cultivation, which comprises a base (14) from which a series of uprights (15) extend upwards, which can receive anchoring elements (13), adjustable in a radial position and acting on a wall of the pot. Said potholder comprises adjustable seats (16) for housing spacer elements (12) for adjacent pot-holders (11) and in particular the uprights (15) are in the form of radial couples, whereby each couple identifies a U-shaped seat (16) facing upwards and suitable for receiving one of the anchoring elements (13) and one of the spacer elements (12). The spacer element is generally star-shaped and the anchoring element is wedge-shaped. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 7/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264566 A2 20021211; EP 1264566 A3 20031008; IT MI20011050 A1 20021121; IT MI20011050 D0 20010521

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040409

2004-08-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI