Global Patent Index - EP 1264569 A3

EP 1264569 A3 2003-06-18 - Broom with reservoir and means for regulating the outflow of cleaning and floors treatment products

Title (en)

Broom with reservoir and means for regulating the outflow of cleaning and floors treatment products

Title (de)

Mop mit Behälter und Einstellvorrichtung der Durchflussmenge von Bodenreinigungs- und Bodenbehandlungsprodukten

Title (fr)

Balai muni d'un réservoir et d'un dispositif pour réguler l'écoulement des produits de nettoyage et traitement des sols

Publication

EP 1264569 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02010378 A

Priority

IT PD20010128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1264569A2] This patent is about an improved controlling system for the regulation of the going out of cleaning and floors treatment products from the tank applied on the brooms. The driving of the aforesaid controlling system is carried out by means of a lever hand (16) which is like those lever hands for the brakes control applied on the bicycles' handlebar. In comparison with the already existing controlling system, the present one is characterized by the fact that it is placed on an intermediary step of the broom's handle (2) instead of being placed at the top. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264569 A2 20021211; EP 1264569 A3 20030618; IT PD20010128 A1 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1053044

2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI