Global Patent Index - EP 1264642 A2

EP 1264642 A2 2002-12-11 - Drying process for lacquer coated on a component and apparatus for performing the drying

Title (en)

Drying process for lacquer coated on a component and apparatus for performing the drying

Title (de)

Trocknungsverfahren für auf Bauteile applizierte Lackmaterialien und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Trocknungsverfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de séchage d'une laque revêtue sur un élément et appareil pour la mise en oeuvre du séchage

Publication

EP 1264642 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011996 A

Priority

DE 10127962 A

Abstract (en)

Paint application is followed by two stage drying involving infra-red and circulating air drying. Air drying continues until a specific state of paint cure has been reached. The following infra-red drying stage, preferably using one or more NIR(near infra-red) emitters, continues the cure of paint in areas accessible to the radiation. An Independent claim is also included for the process equipment which comprises a first, air drying chamber and a second, NIR drying chamber. Components to be dried are independently passed through both chambers by conveyers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Trocknungsverfahren für auf Bauteile, insbesondere auf Fahrzeugkarosserien (5) oder deren Teile applizierte Lackmaterialien, wobei nach einer Applikation des Lackmaterials und einem Ablüften das Trocknungsverfahren zweistufig unter Einsatz einer Infrarot-Trocknung und einer Umluft-Trocknung durchgeführt wird. Erfindungsgemäß weist dieses Trocknungsverfahren folgende Verfahrensschritte auf: a) eine Umluft-Trocknung bis zu einem vorbestimmten Aushärtungsgrad des Lackmaterials, und b) eine nachfolgende Infrarot-Trocknung als Nahe-Infrarot-Trocknung (NIR-Trocknung) mit einer Strahlungsfrequenz im nahen Infrarot (NIR) mittels wenigstens eines Nahen-Infrarot-Strahlers (NIR-Strahlers) für eine weitere Erhöhung des Aushärtungsgrades in den strahlenzugänglichen Bereich eines Bauteils nach der Umluft-Trocknung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/02; F26B 3/02; F26B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/02 (2006.01); F26B 3/28 (2006.01); B05D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/0209 (2013.01); F26B 3/283 (2013.01); B05D 3/0263 (2013.01); B05D 3/0413 (2013.01); F26B 2210/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264642 A2 20021211; EP 1264642 A3 20031217; EP 1264642 B1 20060823; DE 10127962 A1 20021219; DE 10127962 B4 20060126; DE 50207900 D1 20061005; ES 2266348 T3 20070301

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-06-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180627

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207900

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2266348 T3

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207900 P 20061005

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040110

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI