Global Patent Index - EP 1264689 A2

EP 1264689 A2 2002-12-11 - Drive of a press folder

Title (en)

Drive of a press folder

Title (de)

Antrieb eines Falzapparats

Title (fr)

Entraînement d'une plieuse de la rotative

Publication

EP 1264689 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02012274 A

Priority

DE 10128122 A

Abstract (en)

The drive arrangement is divided into several sub-systems (A-E) and each sub-system has an associated position regulated drive motor (21,23,2,39,43). The individual sub-systems can be coupled together via couplings. The couplings are in the form of switchable couplings. A first sub-system drives a cutting cylinder and a first cylinder part of a point-folding blade cylinder. AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a perforation arrangement for a rotation printing machine.

Abstract (de)

Durch die Erfindung wird ein schwingungsarmer und platzsparender Antrieb für einen formatumstellbaren Falzapparat geschaffen, der bei Ausfall eines Antriebsmotors (21; 23; 25; 39; 43) ohne Funktionsbeeinträchtigung weiter zu betreiben ist. Der Antrieb für den Falzapparat einer Rotationsdruckmaschine mit antreibbaren rotierenden Baugruppen, insbesondere Schneidzylinder (1), Punktur-Falzmesserzylinder (3), Falzklappenzylinder (4), Greifer-Falzmesserzylinder (5) und Perforierzylinder (37; 38) einer Perforationsvorrichtung (36), ist in einzelne Teilsysteme (A; B; C; D; E) aufgespalten und jedem Teilsystem (A; B; C; D; E) ist ein lagegeregelter Antriebsmotor (21; 23; 25; 39; 43) zugeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/56; B41F 13/004; B41F 13/008; B65H 35/00; B65H 35/08; B65H 45/16; B65H 45/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/168 (2013.01); B65H 45/28 (2013.01); B65H 2403/943 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264689 A2 20021211; EP 1264689 A3 20050420; EP 1264689 B1 20070815; CA 2389839 A1 20021209; CA 2389839 C 20060815; DE 10128122 A1 20021212; DE 50210677 D1 20070927; US 2002185022 A1 20021212; US 6776750 B2 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210677

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120605

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120606

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120605

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50210677

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRA?E 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071003

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210677 P 20070927

2007-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2007-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2006-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051129

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-27 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 13/56 A

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 13/004 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 13/008 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 35/00 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 35/08 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 45/16 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 45/28 B

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI