Global Patent Index - EP 1264708 A2

EP 1264708 A2 2002-12-11 - Method for producing a chemical resistant protective layer for a rotary body comprising a fibrous reinforcement and a rotary body

Title (en)

Method for producing a chemical resistant protective layer for a rotary body comprising a fibrous reinforcement and a rotary body

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer chemikalienbeständigen Schutzschicht für Rotationskörper aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff und ein Rotationskörper

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une couche protectrice pour un corps rotative comprenant une armature fibreuse et un corps rotative

Publication

EP 1264708 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02012208 A

Priority

DE 10127908 A

Abstract (en)

Preparation of a chemically resistant protective coating for a solid of revolution with a base body comprising fiber-reinforced plastics, especially for printing press roll bodies, involving application of hard rubber or thermoplastic coating containing 5-80 vol.% of metal or ceramic to the resultant smooth base, and application of a functional layer of metal and/or plastic to the ground surface containing dispersed particles, preferably by hot spraying is new. <??>An Independent claim is included for a solid of revolution, e.g. a sleeve, with a fiber reinforced plastics base carrying a chemically resistant intermediate hard rubber or thermoplastic coating, with 5-80 vol.% of a metal- or ceramic dispersion, and coated with a metal and/or ceramic functional coating applied by a special printing technique.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine chemikalienbeständige, korrosionsfeste Beschichtung mit insbesonderer drucktechnischer Funktionalität auf Rotationskörpern insbesondere für Druckmaschinen, die aus Gewichtungs-, Festigkeits- und Dynamikgründen aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff, Kohlenstoff oder Metall hergestellt sind und ohne eine derartige Beschichtung rasch durch Wechselwirkung mit Druckhilfsstoffen wie z.B. Farben, Feuchtmittel, Waschmittel, Reinigungsmittel etc. geschädigt werden. Dazu wird erfindungsgemäß der Rotationskörper zuerst mit einer Beschichtung aus Hartgummi oder Thermoplast mit einem Metall- oder Keramikdispersionsanteil von 5 Vol % bis 80 Vol % versehen und danach auf die angeschliffene, die Dispersionspartikel enthaltende freie Oberfläche in einem weiteren Schritt vorzugsweise durch thermisches Spritzen eine drucktechnische Funktionsschicht aus Metall und / oder Keramik aufgebracht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 7/00; B05D 5/02; B05D 5/08; B05D 7/02; B29C 70/02; C23C 4/02; C23C 28/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/02 (2006.01); B41N 7/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/00 (2013.01); B05D 7/02 (2013.01); B41N 7/00 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/04 (2013.01); B41N 2207/10 (2013.01); B41N 2207/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264708 A2 20021211; EP 1264708 A3 20040421; EP 1264708 B1 20080730; DE 10127908 A1 20021219; DE 50212557 D1 20080911; US 2002187292 A1 20021212; US 6797331 B2 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50212557

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140604

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50212557

- Effective date: 20120626

2009-07-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212557 P 20080911

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2005-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41N 7/00 A

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 70/02 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 28/00 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/08 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/02 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/02 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 7/02 B

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI