Global Patent Index - EP 1264775 A3

EP 1264775 A3 2003-06-18 - Folded product and method for its manufacture

Title (en)

Folded product and method for its manufacture

Title (de)

Falzprodukt und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Produit plié et méthode pour sa production

Publication

EP 1264775 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02012261 A

Priority

DE 10127800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1264775A2] The product is folded from sheet (1, 2) with at least one row of transversely folded sectors (1a, 1b, 1c, 2a, 2b, 2c) and at least one row of longitudinally folded sectors. At least two sheets are used, forming a series of transversely or longitudinally folded sheet sectors and crossing each other. The sheet sectors are joined to each other in the crossing zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B65D 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/008 (2013.01); B65D 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264775 A2 20021211; EP 1264775 A3 20030618; DE 10127800 A1 20030123

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI