Global Patent Index - EP 1264776 A1

EP 1264776 A1 2002-12-11 - Pivotable spout for a pouch

Title (en)

Pivotable spout for a pouch

Title (de)

Schwenkauslauf für einen Folienbeutel

Title (fr)

Bec verseur pivotable pour un sachet en feuille

Publication

EP 1264776 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02008396 A

Priority

DE 10127895 A

Abstract (en)

A closure element for a packaging unit, in particular, a foil bag for liquids or pastes comprises a pivotable spout (2) which has an outlet channel (13), closes the outlet opening (3) in one pivot position, and connects it to the outlet channel in another pivot position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verschlusselement (1) für eine Verpackung zur Aufnahme von flüssigem oder pastösem Gut, insbesondere für einen Folienbeutel. Damit ein Verschlusselement (1) einfach zu öffnen und wieder zu verschießen ist, wenig Platz benötigt und eine Verpackung auch nach dem Abfüllen mikrobiologisch dicht verschließt, umfasst das Verschlusselement einen kippbaren Ausgießer (2) mit einem Ausgießkanal (13) und einer Ausgießöffnung (3), die durch den Ausgießer (2) in einer ersten Kippposition verschlossen ist, und in einer zweiten Kippposition des Ausgießers (2) in Verbindung mit dessen Ausgießkanal (13) steht, wobei der Ausgießer (2) im Bereich der Ausgießöffnung (3) mit einer Membran (4), die die Ausgießöffnung (3) verschließt, verbunden ist, die bei einer Kippbewegung des Ausgießers (2) aufreißt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/30; B65D 33/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 5/74 (2006.01); B65D 25/46 (2006.01); B65D 33/36 (2006.01); B65D 33/38 (2006.01); B65D 41/62 (2006.01); B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 47/26 (2006.01); B65D 47/30 (2006.01); B65D 47/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/305 (2013.01); B65D 75/5861 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0007 (2013.01); B65D 2231/002 (2013.01); B65D 2231/004 (2013.01); B65D 2251/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264776 A1 20021211; BG 106791 A 20031231; BR 0202163 A 20030422; CA 2389774 A1 20021208; CN 1390751 A 20030115; CZ 20021972 A3 20040414; DE 10127895 A1 20021212; HR P20020495 A2 20030630; HU 0201929 A2 20030128; HU 0201929 A3 20040428; HU 0201929 D0 20020828; JP 2003026215 A 20030129; KR 20020093634 A 20021216; PL 354346 A1 20021216; RU 2002115082 A 20040120; RU 2234445 C2 20040820; SK 8032002 A3 20030109; TR 200201519 A2 20030121; TW 567164 B 20031221; US 2003015556 A1 20030123; YU 42102 A 20030829; ZA 200204562 B 20030214

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051521

2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041102

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021025

- Countries: AL

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021025

- Countries: LT

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021025

- Countries: LV

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021025

- Countries: MK

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021025

- Countries: RO

2003-09-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021025

- Countries: SI

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI