Global Patent Index - EP 1264782 A1

EP 1264782 A1 2002-12-11 - Dispenser for abrasive paper

Title (en)

Dispenser for abrasive paper

Title (de)

Spender für Schleifpapier

Title (fr)

Distributeur pour papier abrasif

Publication

EP 1264782 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01304857 A

Priority

EP 01304857 A

Abstract (en)

A dispenser (20) for dispensing abrasive paper from a roll can be held in a user's hand. The dispenser has a body (5) for receiving a roll of abrasive paper, and the body has an aperture (19) to allow a free end (10) of a roll of abrasive paper to pass out of the body (5). The aperture (19) is normally open and a user can close the aperture thereby to trap abrasive paper. The body (5) is spring-loaded so as to bias the aperture (19) towards its open position. A user can close the aperture by applying pressure to the body. A tearing edge 6 for tearing a desired length of abrasive paper from a roll is provided. The tearing edge (6) is preferably spaced from the aperture (19) so that after a piece of abrasive paper is torn from the roll the new free end of the roll protrudes from the dispenser. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/08; B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/08 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/002 (2013.01); B65D 83/0805 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5154 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264782 A1 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060802

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050131

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI