Global Patent Index - EP 1264784 A1

EP 1264784 A1 2002-12-11 - Vessel for enabling a uniform gravity driven flow of particulate bulk material therethrough, and direct reduction reactor incorporating same

Title (en)

Vessel for enabling a uniform gravity driven flow of particulate bulk material therethrough, and direct reduction reactor incorporating same

Title (de)

Gefäss zum Ermöglichen von gleichmassigem Schwerkraftabfluss von Schüttgut und Direktreduktionsreaktor derselben enthaltend

Title (fr)

Cuve permettant l'écoulement uniforme par gravité de matières en vrac et réacteur à réduction directe le comportant

Publication

EP 1264784 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112862 A

Priority

EP 01112862 A

Abstract (en)

So as to provide a container that is inexpensive to manufacture and that promotes a uniform flow of particulate bulk materials therethrough, a vessel (10) is suggested comprising at least two wall segments (12, 14) having a generally downwardly converging wall defining a vertical axis for said vessel, a first upper segment (12) being vertically arranged above a second lower segment (14), each one of said wall segments having an upper edge and a lower edge, the perimeter of the upper edge of said second lower wall segment (14) being larger than the perimeter of the lower edge of said first upper wall segment (12); said lower edge of said first upper wall segment (12) and said upper edge of said second lower wall segment (14) being positioned proximate to each other and cooperating to provide an enlargement (34) of the cross-sectional area of the volume occupied by said particulate solid material; and the lower edge of said first upper segment (12) defining a plane forming an angle with respect to the vertical axis of the vessel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/26; B65D 88/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/26 (2006.01); B65D 88/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264784 A1 20021211; EP 1264784 B1 20040407; DE 60102677 D1 20040513; DE 60102677 T2 20050324; MX PA02005441 A 20040812

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60102677 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-11-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: QUINTERO-FLORES, RAUL GERARDO

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECERRA-NOVOA, JORGE OCTAVIO

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CELADA-GONZALEZ, JUAN

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUERRA-REYES, MARIA TERESA

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOPEZ-GOMEZ, RONALD VICTOR MANUEL

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI