Global Patent Index - EP 1264792 A1

EP 1264792 A1 2002-12-11 - Device and method for dividing a stack of sheets into reams of a predetermined number of sheets

Title (en)

Device and method for dividing a stack of sheets into reams of a predetermined number of sheets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung and Verfahren zur Unterteilung eines Stapels von Blättern in Riese vorgegebener Blattzahl

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de division d'une pile de feuilles en rames d'un nombre de feuilles prédéterminé

Publication

EP 1264792 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01710027 A

Priority

EP 01710027 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet stack dividing device has a grip (30) with first and second pressing cushions (32, 33), a blade (35) to insert into the stack at a preset height from its top edge, and a grip fork (40) to hand the separated ream. The grip fork has a fork part (41) and an upper part (42) to clamp the ream between the fork part and itself.

Abstract (de)

Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es daher, eine Vorrichtung zum Aufteilen eines Stapels von Blättern in Einzelriese vorgegebener Größer zu schaffen, mittels der sowohl ein genaues Bestimmen der Blattzahl als auch ein weitgehend beschädigungsfreies Entstspeln vorgenommen werden kann. Bei einer erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtung wird ein Stapel von Blättern in Einzelriese vorgegebener Blattzahl aufgeteilt, wozu ein Greifer (30) vorgesehen ist. Der Greifer weist zur Erzeugung einer vorgebbaren Flächenpressung im aufzuteilenden Stapel ein erstes Anpresskissen (32), ein Schwert (35) zum Anstechen des aufzuteilenden Stapels in vorgebbarer Höhe vom oberen Rand des Stapels und eine Greifzange (40) zum Handhaben des auszusondernden Rieses auf. Die Greifzange (40) besteht aus einer Gabel (41) und aus einem Zangenoberteil (42) zum klemmenden Halten des Rieses zwischen Gabel und Zangenoberteil. Gemäß der Erfindung ist neben dem ersten Anpresskissen (32), das anstechseitig auf den Stapel von Blättern einwirkt, auch ein zweites Anpresskissen (33) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/32; B65H 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/322 (2013.01); B65H 83/025 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4223 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42242 (2013.01); B65H 2405/52 (2013.01); B65H 2511/30 (2013.01); B65H 2601/511 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1826 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1484270 A2 20041208; EP 1484270 A3 20050105; EP 1484270 B1 20100811; DE 50110700 D1 20060921; DE 50115596 D1 20100923; EP 1264792 A1 20021211; EP 1264792 B1 20060809; ES 2269336 T3 20070401; ES 2349734 T3 20110111

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-07-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140608

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110700

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110700

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH + CO. KG

- Free text: BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH + CO. KG#DAIMLERSTRASSE 6-10#72639 NEUFFEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH + CO. KG#DAIMLERSTRASSE 6-10#72639 NEUFFEN (DE)

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269336 T3

2006-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110700 P 20060921

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI SE

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH + CO. KG

2004-11-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI SE

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI SE

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI