Global Patent Index - EP 1264920 A2

EP 1264920 A2 2002-12-11 - Drawing frame for a spinning machine with following fibre condensing zone

Title (en)

Drawing frame for a spinning machine with following fibre condensing zone

Title (de)

Streckwerk für eine Spinnereimaschine mit einer nachgeordneten Faserbündelungszone

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étirage dans une machine de filature suivi d'une zone de condensation des fibres

Publication

EP 1264920 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02012022 A

Priority

DE 10127741 A

Abstract (en)

The sliver drawing unit, for a spinning machine, has a fiber bundling zone (3) after the final pair of drawing rollers (1) with an upper (1.1) and lower (1.2) roller. The fiber bundling zone has a pneumatic condenser (4), with a suction shoe (8) linked to a suction source (10) to support the path of the continuous perforated belt (6) which carries the fibers. The fiber condensing zone is defined by two clamping points (K1,K2), formed by the nip between the final drawing rollers on one side. A continuous upper belt (12), to support the carried fibers on the perforated transport belt, is aligned at a wedge angle to it, tapering towards the second clamping point.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Streckwerk für eine Spinnereimaschine, mit einer einem Ausgangswalzenpaar 1 mit Oberwalze 1.1 und Unterwalze 1.2 des Streckwerks nachgeordneten Faserbündelungszone 3, welche eine pneumatische Verdichtungsvorrichtung 4 mit einem von einem perforierten Transportmittel 6 umschlungenen Saugschuh 8 enthält, der an einer Unterdruckquelle 10 angeschlossen ist, wobei die Fasserbündelungszone 3 durch zwei Klemmstellen K1, K2 begrenzt ist, deren erste K1 durch die beiden Walzen 1.1; 1.2 des Ausgangswalzenpaares 1 definiert ist, wobei dem perforierten Transportmittel 6 ein konisch zur zweiten Klemmstelle K2 zulaufendes Riemchen 12 zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/26; D01H 5/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/74 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/26 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D01H 5/86 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264920 A2 20021211; EP 1264920 A3 20030521; DE 10127741 A1 20030123; DE 10127741 C2 20030508; JP 2002371441 A 20021226; US 2002184737 A1 20021212; US 6604261 B2 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH IT LI

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 01H 5/72 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 01H 5/86 B

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI