Global Patent Index - EP 1264925 A2

EP 1264925 A2 2002-12-11 - Washing machine with weight sensor

Title (en)

Washing machine with weight sensor

Title (de)

Waschmaschine mit einem Gewichtserfassungsmittel

Title (fr)

Machine à laver avec un capteur de poids

Publication

EP 1264925 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02011152 A

Priority

IT PN20010041 A

Abstract (en)

The washing machine comprises a sensor (8) adapted to detect the displacement of the oscillating assembly (2) and arranged between a vibration-damping strut (3) of said oscillating assembly and the framework (5) of the machine, upstream of the support feet thereof, so as to be able to sense the variations in the weight of the oscillating assembly in a manner that is independent of the braking force of the vibration-damping strut (3) and the weight of the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/00; D06F 33/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264925 A2 20021211; EP 1264925 A3 20031126; IT PN20010041 A1 20021209

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-09-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06F 39/00 A

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06F 33/10 B

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI