Global Patent Index - EP 1264928 A2

EP 1264928 A2 2002-12-11 - Laundry dryer for sensitive clothes

Title (en)

Laundry dryer for sensitive clothes

Title (de)

Wäschetrockner für empfindliche Textilien

Title (fr)

Sèche-linge pour vêtements sensibles

Publication

EP 1264928 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006762 A

Priority

CH 10172001 A

Abstract (en)

The washer-dryer has a drum (2) with a rotary drive and an essentially horizontal rotation axis (3) and a fan (5) and air feed arrangement (7,7') for blowing drying air into an inner drum chamber. The air feed arrangement is designed so that the drying air is essentially exclusively blown from below into the interior of the drum.

Abstract (de)

Erfindungsgemäss kann der Wäschetrockner zum Trocknen empfindlicher Textilien so betrieben werden, dass die Trockenluft im wesentlichen ausschliesslich von unten in den Innenraum der Trommel (2) eingeblasen wird. Dies hat den Vorteil, dass Textilien, die in der Trommel liegen, zwangsläufig von der Trockenluft durchblasen werden, ohne dass es notwendig ist, die Textilien hochzuwerfen. Dadurch kann die mechanische Beanspruchung der Textilien reduziert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/02; D06F 58/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/02 (2006.01); D06F 58/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/04 (2013.01); D06F 58/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264928 A2 20021211; EP 1264928 A3 20030917; EP 1264928 B1 20060503; DE 50206624 D1 20060608

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: V-ZUG AG

- Free text: V-ZUG AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 66#6301 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- V-ZUG AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 66#6301 ZUG (CH)

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206624 P 20060608

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI SE

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI SE

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-04 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI