Global Patent Index - EP 1264936 A2

EP 1264936 A2 2002-12-11 - Guide device and car park

Title (en)

Guide device and car park

Title (de)

Leitvorrichtung und Parkplatz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage et parking

Publication

EP 1264936 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02011991 A

Priority

GB 0113493 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a guide device (2) for helping drivers to guide their vehicles into parking spaces, and a car park that includes a plurality of the guide devices for delimiting the boundaries of parking spaces in which vehicles may be parked, thereby defining the layout of the car park. The guide device (2) includes a support member (10) that is constructed and arranged to stand on the ground, at least one arm that is supported by the support member and in use extends substantially horizontally from the support member, and a ground anchor (12) having a lower part for anchoring in the ground and an upper part to which the support member may be attached. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/017; E01F 9/011

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E01F 9/017 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/629 (2016.02); E01F 9/685 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264936 A2 20021211; EP 1264936 A3 20051116; GB 0113493 D0 20010725; US 2003005876 A1 20030109

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-08-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI