Global Patent Index - EP 1264950 A1

EP 1264950 A1 2002-12-11 - Door latch

Title (en)

Door latch

Title (de)

Türverriegelung

Title (fr)

Verrou de porte

Publication

EP 1264950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02291155 A

Priority

US 28946401 P

Abstract (en)

A latch door operator if provided for use with an electrical door operator for improving the sealing capabilities of a plug door commonly used in multi-passenger mass transit vehicles. The essential components of the latch door operator comprise a striker member suspended within the door frame which cooperates with a catcher member which is pivotally mounted to the door. The striker member is capable of moving in one of a first and second direction upon the application of a force thereto. An actuating device is provided for applying one of an actuating and retracting force to the striker member. The striker member also includes a nose portion located at a first end thereof. The catcher member, which is mounted to the door, has a first end portion which is capable of cooperating with the nose portion of the striker member upon the application of an actuating force to the striker member. This actuating force causes the striker member to move in a first direction to compress the sealing member associated with the door to one of a wall portion or door frame of the transport vehicle and to latch the door in a closed position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/00 (2013.01); E05B 17/0025 (2013.01); E05B 15/0086 (2013.01); E05B 15/022 (2013.01); E05B 17/0029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1264950 A1 20021211; EP 1264950 B1 20040818; BR 0206881 A 20040824; CA 2384615 A1 20021108; DE 60200976 D1 20040923

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060507

2006-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060507

2005-08-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-11-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200976 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-02-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DOOR LATCH

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI