Global Patent Index - EP 1264965 A2

EP 1264965 A2 2002-12-11 - Bearing housing of a turbocharger for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Bearing housing of a turbocharger for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Lagergehäuse eines Abgasturboladers für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Logement de palier d'un turbocompresseur pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1264965 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009633 A

Priority

DE 10121920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10121920A1] The turbo charger has a compressor stage, bearing cage and turbine stage with the compressor and turbine rotor mounted on a common rotor shaft. A ventilation system is formed by a ring chamber (10) inside the bearing cage (4) and having a volume sufficient to completely separate the oil and air. The bearing cage has an oil chamber (9) for holding the hydrodynamic bearing of the rotor shaft (7) and surrounded coaxially at least in part by the ring chamber to ventilate the lubricating oil.

Abstract (de)

Um für einen Abgasturbolader (1) für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einer Verdichterstufe (2), einem Lagergehäuse (4) und einer Turbinenstufe (3), wobei Verdichter- und Turbinenlaufrad (5,6) auf einer gemeinsamen Rotorwelle (7) sitzen, dem ein Entlüftungssystem zur Separation von Öl aus dem Schmierölkreislauf und Luft, die aus der Verdichter- und Turbinenstufe (2,3) in das Lagergehäuse (4) eindringt, zugeordnet ist, einen genügend großen Raum zur Verfügung zu stellen, mit diesem eine ausreichende Separation von Öl aus dem Schmiersystem und Luft, die über die Rotorwellendichtungen des Abgasturboladers aus dem Verdichter und der Turbine in dessen Lagergehäuse gelangen kann, gewährleistet werden kann und der sich zudem aufwandmindernd in den Abgasturbolader integrieren lässt, ist vorgesehen, dass als Entlüftungssystem ein Ringraum (10) mit einem zur vollständigen Separation von Öl und Luft ausreichendem Volumen innerhalb des Lagergehäuses (4) angelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/18; F01M 11/08; F02B 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/12 (2006.01); F01D 25/14 (2006.01); F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F01D 25/18 (2006.01); F02B 39/00 (2006.01); F02B 39/14 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 39/14 (2013.01); F01D 25/125 (2013.01); F01D 25/14 (2013.01); F01D 25/16 (2013.01); F01D 25/18 (2013.01); F01M 2013/026 (2013.01); F01M 2013/027 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0422 (2013.01); F05D 2220/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 10121920 A1 20021114; DE 10121920 C2 20030515; EP 1264965 A2 20021211; EP 1264965 A3 20041006; JP 2002364376 A 20021218; JP 4099004 B2 20080611

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100604

2010-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE

2010-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL SE

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2005-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI