Global Patent Index - EP 1265034 A1

EP 1265034 A1 2002-12-11 - Mounting of a turbine ceramic matrix composite combustion chamber with brazed mounting lugs

Title (en)

Mounting of a turbine ceramic matrix composite combustion chamber with brazed mounting lugs

Title (de)

Befestigung einer Turbinenbrennkammer aus keramischem Matrix-Verbundswerkstoff mit gelöteten Befestigungsfüssen

Title (fr)

Accrochage de chambre de combustion CMC de turbomachine par pattes brasées

Publication

EP 1265034 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291363 A

Priority

FR 0107363 A

Abstract (en)

The composite combustion chamber for a gas turbine is held between the inner and outer metallic envelopes (12,14) by flexible metal tongues (58,60). The tongues have one end attached to metal rings (66) fixed to the envelopes and the other end attached to a composite ring (78) attached to the combustion chamber. The flexibility of the tongues accommodates difference in expansion rates between the metal rings and the composite chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/60; F23R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/42 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/60 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F05B 2230/606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1265034 A1 20021211; EP 1265034 B1 20081022; DE 60229465 D1 20081204; FR 2825783 A1 20021213; FR 2825783 B1 20031107; JP 2003014234 A 20030115; JP 3907529 B2 20070418; US 2002184892 A1 20021212; US 6708495 B2 20040323

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES

- Effective date: 20170719

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60229465

2016-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60229465 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOUNTING OF A TURBINE CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE COMBUSTION CHAMBER WITH BRAZED MOUNTING LUGS

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI