Global Patent Index - EP 1265036 A1

EP 1265036 A1 2002-12-11 - Elastic mounting of a ceramic matrix composite combustion chamber inside a metallic casing

Title (en)

Elastic mounting of a ceramic matrix composite combustion chamber inside a metallic casing

Title (de)

Elastische Befestigung einer Turbinenbrennkammer aus keramischem Matrix-Verbundwerkstoff in einem metallischen Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Montage élastique de chambre de combustion CMC de turbomachine dans un carter métallique

Publication

EP 1265036 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291365 A

Priority

FR 0107361 A

Abstract (en)

The elastic mounting for a composite combustion chamber in a gas turbine engine has elastic tongues (58,60) to connect it to the envelope rings. Each tongue has three branches with the ends (62,64) of two of the branches solidly fixed to the upstream end (68,70) of the combustion chamber with respect to the fixings. The end of the other branch is fixed to the metal envelope by a third fixing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/60; F23R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/20 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/42 (2006.01); F23R 3/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/60 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F05B 2230/606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1265036 A1 20021211; EP 1265036 B1 20081022; DE 60229466 D1 20081204; FR 2825781 A1 20021213; FR 2825781 B1 20040206; JP 2003021334 A 20030124; JP 4031292 B2 20080109; US 2002184890 A1 20021212; US 6732532 B2 20040511

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES

- Effective date: 20170719

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60229466 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI