Global Patent Index - EP 1265198 A2

EP 1265198 A2 2002-12-11 - Device and method for investigating documents

Title (en)

Device and method for investigating documents

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Untersuchung von Dokumenten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour analyser des documents

Publication

EP 1265198 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008257 A

Priority

DE 10127837 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has at least one stimulation device for stimulating luminescent light (16) in or on the document (10) under investigation and at least two detector units (1,2) for detecting at least some of the luminescent light emitted by the document. The detector units are arranged one behind the other in relation to the luminescent light emitted by the document. AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a method of investigating documents.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein entsprechendes Verfahren zur Untersuchung von Dokumenten, insbesondere Wert-, Ausweis- oder Sicherheitsdokumenten, mit mindestens einer Anregungseinrichtung zur Anregung von Lumineszenzlicht (16) in oder auf einem zu untersuchenden Dokument (10) und mindestens zwei Detektoreinheiten (1, 2) zur Erfassung zumindest eines Teils des von dem Dokument (10) emittierten Lumineszenzlichts (16). Zur Erhöhung der Zuverlässigkeit der Untersuchung der spektralen Charakteristik des Lumineszenzlichts (16) ist vorgesehen, daß die Detektoreinheiten (1, 2) bezogen auf das von dem Dokument (10) emittierte Lumineszenzlicht (16) hintereinander angeordnet sind. Hierdurch trifft das Lumineszenzlicht (16) nacheinander auf die Detektoreinheiten (1, 2) und wird dabei von diesen erfaßt. Durch die Erfindung werden etwaige Parallaxenfehler, die besonders bei seitlich versetzter Anordnung der Detektoreinheiten auftreten, stark reduziert, so daß die Detektoreinheiten (1, 2) das von einem gemeinsamen räumlichen Teilbereich (11) des Dokuments (10) emittierte Lumineszenzlicht (16) erfassen können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/12; H04N 1/48; H01L 27/146

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/1205 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/1205 (2017.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1265198 A2 20021211; EP 1265198 A3 20050112; DE 10127837 A1 20030123; US 2002185615 A1 20021212; US 6777704 B2 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2005-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050712

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07D 7/12 A

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 1/48 B

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01L 27/146 B

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI